Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop István Bagi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Bavagaliana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1931Born
12 Jun 195523.9Ordained PriestPriest
31 Mar 197947.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary
31 Mar 197947.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Bavagaliana
30 Apr 197947.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bavagaliana
31 Jan 198654.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

MicroData Summary for István Bagi
Bishop István Bagi (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKörmend
Ordained BishopCathedral, Esztergom, Archdiocese of Esztergom

  • a priest for 30.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 55, Number 4,029

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast