Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Árpád Fábián, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Bishop of Szombathely, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1926Born
17 Jun 195124.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
8 Feb 197245.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Szombathely, Hungary
8 Feb 197245.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Clypia
16 Mar 197245.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Clypia
7 Jan 197548.1AppointedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
14 May 198659.5DiedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Árpád Fábián (VIAF: 121361520)
Bishop Árpád Fábián O. Praem. (born , died ) Bishop of Szombathely

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKosice
Ordained BishopSzent István, Cathedral, Budapest, Archdiocese of Esztergom

  • a priest for 34.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 997

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast