Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Baptist Attakruh

Bishop of Sekondi-Takoradi, Ghana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1957 Born
30 Jul 198931.7Ordained PriestPriest of Sekondi-Takoradi, Ghana
31 Jul 202062.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Sekondi-Takoradi, Ghana
24 Jun 202163.6AppointedBishop of Sekondi-Takoradi, Ghana
24 Sep 202163.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sekondi-Takoradi, Ghana

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Attakruh
Bishop John Baptist Attakruh (born ) Bishop of Sekondi-Takoradi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJuabo, Archdiocese of Cape Coast
Ordained BishopStar of the Sea, Cathedral, Takoradi, Diocese of Sekondi-Takoradi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sekondi-Takoradi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: AM, 19 Nov 2020
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Jun 2021
  • ob: CB, 24 Jul 2021
  • mn: CB, 18 Sep 2021
  • c2+: CB, 24 Sep 2021
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 249, Number 20,760

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Oct 2021

Quantcast