Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Stanley Kenneth Arnold

Bishop of Salford, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1953 Born
16 Jul 198330.0Ordained PriestPriest of Westminster, England, Great Britain
6 Dec 200552.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
6 Dec 200552.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Lindisfarna
2 Feb 200652.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lindisfarna
30 Sep 201461.2AppointedBishop of Salford, England, Great Britain
8 Dec 201461.4InstalledBishop of Salford, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Stanley Kenneth Arnold (VIAF: 41080759)
Bishop John Stanley Kenneth Arnold (born ) Bishop of Salford

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSheffield, West Riding of Yorkshire, Diocese of Leeds, England
Ordained PriestVenerable English, College, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopMost Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Salford.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Dec 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,050
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018
  • bp: CL, 6 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 16 Oct 2022