Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Franz Valerian Felix von Arco

Deceased

Bishop of Chiemsee, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1686Born
172538.2Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
21 Dec 172943.2AppointedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
26 Feb 173043.4Ordained BishopBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
24 Mar 174659.5DiedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany

MicroData Summary for Joseph Franz Valerian Felix von Arco
Bishop Joseph Franz Valerian Felix von Arco (born , died ) Bishop of Chiemsee

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArco
Ordained BishopCathedral, Salzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg, Austria

  • a priest for 21.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1730, Number 10
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 157
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 59, Number 4,383

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast