Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinand Joseph Gabriel von Sarentheim

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Hypsus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1697³Born
8 Apr 171922.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
16 Mar 172022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
25 Jun 172730.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
25 Jun 172730.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Hypsus
30 Nov 172730.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hypsus
20 Dec 176265.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ferdinand Joseph Gabriel von Sarentheim
Bishop Ferdinand Joseph Gabriel von Sarentheim (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceInnsbruck

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 223
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 44
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 56, Number 4,071

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast