Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Leopold Karl Cardinal von Kollonitsch Lipót

Deceased

Archbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Cardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1631Born
166634.1SelectedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
1668²36.1Ordained PriestPriest of Nitra, Slovakia
30 Apr 166836.5ConfirmedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
26 Aug 166836.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
29 Aug 166937.8SelectedBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
19 May 167038.5ConfirmedBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
2 Sep 168654.8Elevated to Cardinal
16 Sep 168654.8AppointedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
14 Nov 168655.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati
6 Mar 169058.3AppointedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
14 Jul 169563.7SelectedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
22 Aug 169563.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
20 Jan 170775.2DiedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Leopold Karl von Kollonitsch Lipót (VIAF: 22933512)
Leopold Karl Cardinal von Kollonitsch Lipót (born , died ) Archbishop of Esztergom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKomárom, Archdiocese of Esztergom
Ordained BishopHouse of the Professed Jesuits, Wien, Diocese of Wien, Austria
Death PlaceWien, Diocese of Wien, Austria
Buried Place (Original)St. Saviour, Church, Poszont (Pressburg)

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 38.4 years
  • a cardinal for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 164, and Page 226
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 285, and Page 290
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 364
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1668, Number 25
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 23, Number 1,312

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast