Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leopold Anton Eleutherius von Firmian

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1679Born
170727.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
11 Mar 171838.7SelectedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
8 May 171838.9ConfirmedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
22 May 171838.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
17 Jan 172444.6AppointedBishop of Seckau, Austria
4 Oct 172748.3SelectedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
22 Dec 172748.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
22 Oct 174465.4DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Leopold Anton Eleutherius von Firmian
Archbishop Leopold Anton Eleutherius von Firmian (born , died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMünchen
Ordained BishopCathedral, Salzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 239, and Page 341
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 349
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 42
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 60, Number 4,534

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast