Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Arango Henao, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Barrancabermeja, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1908Born
6 Sep 193830.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
28 Nov 194739.2AppointedPrefect of Río Magdalena, Colombia
18 Apr 195041.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Bela
18 Apr 195041.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Barrancabermeja, Colombia
11 Jun 195041.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bela
27 Oct 196254.1AppointedBishop of Barrancabermeja, Colombia
23 Dec 198375.3RetiredBishop of Barrancabermeja, Colombia
4 Feb 199384.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Barrancabermeja, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Arango Henao
Bishop Bernardo Arango Henao S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Barrancabermeja

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSonsón

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 42.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1950, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast