Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Serena

Deceased

Archbishop of Sorrento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1882Born
23 Dec 190523.7Ordained PriestPriest of Sorrento, Italy
4 Jul 193553.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Colombia
5 Jul 193553.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Sorrento, Italy
5 Jul 193553.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Myra
11 Aug 193553.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Myra
22 Oct 194563.5SucceededArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
30 Jul 197290.3DiedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Serena
Archbishop Carlo Serena (born , died ) Archbishop of Sorrento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCapri

  • a priest for 66.6 years
  • a bishop for 36.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1935, Number 61
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 100
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 623, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 664, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast