Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elkin Fernando Álvarez Botero

Bishop of Santa Rosa de Osos, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1968 Born
1 Jul 199324.6Ordained PriestPriest of Sonsón-Rionegro, Colombia
28 May 201243.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Medellín, Colombia
28 May 201243.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Gemellae in Numidia
4 Aug 201243.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gemellae in Numidia
22 Oct 202051.9AppointedBishop of Santa Rosa de Osos, Colombia
16 Dec 202052.0InstalledBishop of Santa Rosa de Osos, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Elkin Fernando Álvarez Botero (VIAF: 186793506)
Bishop Elkin Fernando Álvarez Botero (born ) Bishop of Santa Rosa de Osos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEl Retiro
Ordained BishopCathedral, Medellín, Archdiocese of Medellín

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santa Rosa de Osos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 May 2012
  • ob: CB, 28 May 2012
  • c2+: CB, 2 Aug 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,521
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 17 Dec 2020

Quantcast