Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kevin Joseph Aje

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sokoto, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1934Born
12 Jun 196632.1Ordained PriestPriest of Jos, Nigeria
15 Oct 198248.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Sokoto, Nigeria
6 Jan 198348.6Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Sokoto, Nigeria
3 Dec 198450.6SucceededBishop of Sokoto, Nigeria
10 Jun 201177.1RetiredBishop of Sokoto, Nigeria
27 May 201985.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Sokoto, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Kevin Joseph Aje
Bishop Kevin Joseph Aje (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sokoto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmper
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceSokoto, Diocese of Sokoto
Buried Place (Original)Holy Family, Cathedral, Sokoto, Diocese of Sokoto

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Jun 2011
  • c1: CB, 12 Jun 2011
  • d: CB, 27 May 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 77, Number 6,242

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast