Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Román Acevedo Rojas

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Morelia, Michoacán, México

Titular Bishop of Thamugadi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1908Born
17 Dec 193224.8Ordained PriestPriest of Morelia, Michoacán, México
29 Nov 196759.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Morelia, Michoacán, México
29 Nov 196759.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thamugadi
19 Mar 196860.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thamugadi
3 Mar 198375.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Morelia, Michoacán, México
29 May 199486.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Morelia, Michoacán, México

MicroData Summary for Román Acevedo Rojas
Bishop Román Acevedo Rojas (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Morelia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTarimoro
Ordained BishopCathedral, Morelia, Archdiocese of Morelia, Michoacán

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 604

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast