Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo (William Thomas) Acerra, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of United States of America, Military

Titular Bishop of Lete


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1925Born
14 Jun 194519.6ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
20 May 195024.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
29 Sep 198357.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of United States of America, Military
29 Sep 198357.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Lete
29 Nov 198358.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lete
26 Jul 199064.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of United States of America, Military

MicroData Summary for Angelo (William Thomas) Acerra
Bishop Angelo (William Thomas) Acerra O.S.B. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of United States of America, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMemphis, TN
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Death PlaceAlexandria, VA
Buried Place (Original)St. Bernard Abbey, Cemetery, Cullman, AL

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • prof: CB, 3 May 2019
  • mn/loc: CB, 5 Dec 2019
  • mn: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 82, Number 6,758

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast