Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Augusto Zampini

Adjunct Secretary of the Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development

Priest of San Isidro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1969 Born
22 Oct 200435.2Ordained PriestPriest of San Isidro, Argentina
8 Apr 202050.7AppointedAdjunct Secretary of the Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development

MicroData Summary for Augusto Zampini
Father Augusto Zampini (born ) Adjunct Secretary of Promoting Integral Human Development

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires, Argentina

Please contact the Father through the Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Apr 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 10 Apr 2020

Quantcast