Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Gallesi

Deceased

Bishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1639BornFinale
22 Jun 167637.3AppointedBishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia), Italy
Nov 167940.6DiedBishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia), Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Gallesi:
Bishop Domenico Gallesi (born ) Bishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 336

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013