Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Thomas de la Hoz, O.P. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Formosa Island {Isola Formosa), Taiwan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1879Born
189515.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
26 Jul 190323.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
27 Jul 192141.5AppointedPrefect of Formosa Island {Isola Formosa), Taiwan
193252.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Shikoku, Japan
Jan 194161.0ResignedPrefect of Formosa Island {Isola Formosa), Taiwan
Jan 194161.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Shikoku, Japan
6 Jan 194969.0DiedPrefect Emeritus of Formosa Island {Isola Formosa), Taiwan

MicroData Summary for Thomas de la Hoz
Father Thomas de la Hoz O.P. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Formosa Island {Isola Formosa)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVelilla de Guardo, Spain

  • a priest for 45.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: JPG

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast