Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Taurin Cahagne, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Galla

Titular Bishop of Adramyttium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1826BornHeubÚcourt, France
1849¹22.6Ordained PriestPriest
1856¹29.6ProfessedPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
21 Mar 187346.8AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Galla, Ethiopia
21 Mar 187346.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
14 Feb 187548.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
23 May 188054.0SucceededVicar Apostolic of Galla, Ethiopia
1 Sep 189973.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Galla, Ethiopia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis-Taurin Cahagne:
Bishop Louis-Taurin Cahagne O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Galla

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013