Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Acebedo y Flores

Deceased

Bishop of Calbayog


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1901BornPalo
25 Mar 192624.5Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 193736.2AppointedBishop of Calbayog, Philippines
25 Mar 193836.5Ordained BishopBishop of Calbayog, Philippines
25 Jul 195856.8DiedBishop of Calbayog, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Miguel Acebedo y Flores:
Bishop Miguel Acebedo y Flores (born , died ) Bishop of Calbayog

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013