Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sandor Bodonyi

Deceased

Bishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1736³Born
5 Aug 175922.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
31 May 176023.8Ordained PriestPriest
29 Aug 180670.0SelectedBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
17 Nov 180670.2ConfirmedBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
1807²70.4Ordained BishopBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
1812¹75.4DiedBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sandor Bodonyi
Bishop Sandor Bodonyi (born , died 1812) Bishop of Beograd (-Smederevo)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBerki

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 5.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1807, Number 30
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 108

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast