Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luca Natale

Deceased

Bishop of Beograd {Belgrade}


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Jan 1709AppointedBishop of Beograd {Belgrade}, Serbia
30 Jun 1709Ordained BishopBishop of Beograd {Belgrade}, Serbia
19 Jan 1720DiedBishop of Beograd {Belgrade}, Serbia

MicroData Summary for Luca Natale:
Bishop Luca Natale (died ) Bishop of Beograd {Belgrade}

  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 117
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1709, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 6 Jul 2015