Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop IstvŠn Pucz

Deceased

Bishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Apr 1698³Born
28 Nov 172325.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
30 Nov 172325.6Ordained PriestPriest
3 Nov 175456.5SelectedBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
12 May 175557.1ConfirmedBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
24 Mar 177172.9DiedBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for IstvŠn Pucz
Bishop IstvŠn Pucz (born Apr 1698, died ) Bishop of Beograd (-Smederevo)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMihovlje

  • a priest for 47.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 119
  • b: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1755, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast