Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Zlatarić

Deceased

Bishop of Beograd (-Smederevo)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1721³BornDubica
21 Dec 174322.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
4 Apr 174422.8Ordained PriestPriest
24 Feb 177553.7SelectedBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
24 Apr 177553.9ConfirmedBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
30 Jan 179068.6DiedBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anton Zlatarić:
Bishop Anton Zlatarić (born , died ) Bishop of Beograd (-Smederevo)

  • a priest for 45.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 119

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013