Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Zanzottera, O.S.I. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Huaraz, Peru

Titular Bishop of Obori


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1926Born
4 Jul 195428.3Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Saint Joseph
13 Mar 196943.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Huaraz, Peru
13 Mar 196943.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Obori
20 Apr 196943.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Obori
31 May 197044.2ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Huaraz, Peru
18 Jan 200578.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Huaraz, Peru

MicroData Summary for Luigi Zanzottera
Bishop Luigi Zanzottera O.S.I. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Huaraz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Stefano Ticino, Italy

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 35.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast