Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mário Zanetta

Deceased

Bishop of Paulo Afonso, Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1938Born
24 Jun 196224.4Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jun 198850.3AppointedBishop of Paulo Afonso, Bahia, Brazil
14 Aug 198850.5Ordained BishopBishop of Paulo Afonso, Bahia, Brazil
13 Nov 199860.7DiedBishop of Paulo Afonso, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Mário Zanetta
Bishop Mário Zanetta (born , died ) Bishop of Paulo Afonso

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBorgomanero, Italy

  • a priest for 36.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast