Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philip Lasap Za Hawng

Bishop Emeritus of Lashio, Myanmar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1945 Born
1 Mar 197328.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 199348.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Myitkyina, Myanmar
20 Dec 199348.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Avioccala
30 Apr 199449.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Avioccala
3 Apr 199853.1AppointedBishop of Lashio, Myanmar
24 Jun 202075.3RetiredBishop of Lashio, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Philip Lasap Za Hawng
Bishop Philip Lasap Za Hawng (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Lashio

EventPlace
Birth PlacePang-Pu
Ordained BishopMyitkyina, Diocese of Myitkyina

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lashio.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139, Number 12,343
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast