Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop William Warham

Deceased

Archbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1450¹Born
20 Oct 150151.8AppointedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
25 Sep 150252.7Ordained BishopBishop of London, England, Great Britain
29 Nov 150353.9AppointedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
23 Aug 153282.6DiedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for William Warham (VIAF: 58070815)
Archbishop William Warham (born 1450, died ) Archbishop of Canterbury

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChurch Oakley, Hampshire
Ordained BishopFulham
Death PlaceHackington

  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 24
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 298
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 180
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 95
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1502, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 150

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 26 May 2018

Quantcast