Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Rawlins

Deceased

Bishop of Saint David’s, Wales


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Mar 1523AppointedBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
26 Apr 1523Ordained BishopBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
18 Feb 1536DiedBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Richard Rawlins:
Bishop Richard Rawlins (died ) Bishop of Saint David’s

  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 300
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 241
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 98

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013