Catholic-Hierarchy DC

St. John Cardinal Fisher

Deceased

Bishop of Rochester, England

Cardinal-Priest of San Vitale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1469BornBeverley, Yorkshire, England
17 Dec 149123.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Oct 150435.8AppointedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
24 Nov 150435.9Ordained BishopBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
21 May 153566.4Elevated to Cardinal
31 May 153566.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
22 Jun 153566.5DiedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
29 Dec 1886Beatified
19 May 1935Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. John Fisher:
Cardinal St. John Fisher (died ) Bishop of Rochester

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
  • a cardinal for .1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 May 1535
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 569
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 286
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 96

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013