Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Barons (Barnes)

Deceased

Bishop of London, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Aug 1504AppointedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
24 Nov 1504Ordained BishopBishop of London, England, Great Britain
10 Oct 1505DiedBishop of London, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Barons (Barnes)
Bishop William Barons (Barnes) (died ) Bishop of London

EventPlace
Ordained BishopLambeth

  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 298
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 227
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 96
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1504, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast