Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugh Oldham

Deceased

Bishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1452Born
27 Nov 150452.9AppointedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
5 Jan 150553.0Ordained BishopBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
25 Jun 151967.4DiedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Hugh Oldham
Bishop Hugh Oldham (born 1452, died ) Bishop of Exeter

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLancashire

  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 377
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 193
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 96
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1505, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 26 May 2018

Quantcast