Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Fox

Deceased

Bishop of Winchester, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1448Born
29 Jan 148739.1AppointedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
8 Apr 148739.3Ordained BishopBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
8 Feb 149244.1AppointedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
30 Jul 149446.6AppointedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
20 Aug 150153.6AppointedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain
14 Sep 152880.7DiedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Richard Fox:
Bishop Richard Fox (died ) Bishop of Winchester

  • a bishop for 41.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 142, and Page 376
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 103, and Page 152
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 16, and Page 292
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 269, and Page 147
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 94

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013