Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicholas West

Deceased

Bishop of Ely, England


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Jul 1515AppointedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
7 Oct 1515Ordained BishopBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
28 Apr 1533DiedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Nicholas West:
Bishop Nicholas West (died ) Bishop of Ely

  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 341
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 191
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 97

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013