Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Standish, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Saint Asaph, Wales


Events

DateEventTitle
28 May 1518AppointedBishop of Saint Asaph, Wales, Great Britain
11 Jul 1518Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Asaph, Wales, Great Britain
9 Jul 1535DiedBishop of Saint Asaph, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Henry Standish:
Bishop Henry Standish O.F.M. Conv. (died ) Bishop of Saint Asaph

  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 120
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 73
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 98

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013