Catholic-Hierarchy DC

John Cardinal Morton

Deceased

Archbishop of Canterbury, England

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1420BornBere Regis
8 Aug 147858.6SelectedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
30 Oct 147858.8ConfirmedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
31 Jan 147959.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
29 Aug 148060.7InstalledBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
8 Oct 148666.8AppointedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
20 Sep 149373.7Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 149373.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
15 Sep 150080.7DiedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Morton:
Cardinal John Morton (died ) Archbishop of Canterbury

  • a bishop for 21.6 years
  • a cardinal for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Sep 1493
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 340
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 150
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 93

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013