Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Booth

Deceased

Bishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Jul 1516AppointedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
30 Nov 1516Ordained BishopBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
5 May 1535DiedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Charles Booth
Bishop Charles Booth (died ) Bishop of Hereford

EventPlace
Ordained BishopOxford

  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 467
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 209
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 98
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1516, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 May 2018

Quantcast