Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Thomas Cardinal Bourchier

Deceased

Archbishop of Canterbury, England

Cardinal-Priest of San Ciriaco alle Terme Diocleziane


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1412¹Born
1433²21.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 Sep 143321.7AppointedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
15 May 143523.4Ordained BishopBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
20 Dec 144332.0AppointedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
1445²33.0InstalledBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
21 Jun 145442.5AppointedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
22 Aug 145442.6InstalledArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
18 Sep 146755.7Elevated to Cardinal
13 May 146856.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Ciriaco alle Terme Diocleziane
30 Mar 148674.2DiedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Bourchier:
Cardinal Thomas Bourchier (died ) Archbishop of Canterbury

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 50.9 years
  • a cardinal for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Sep 1467
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 339
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 150, and Page 268
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 61
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 88

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013