Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Nabil Andari

Auxiliary Bishop of Joubbé, Sarba e Jounieh (Maronite), Lebanon

Titular Bishop of Tarsus dei Maroniti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1949 Born
27 Aug 197727.8Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jun 199747.5AppointedCurial Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
7 Jun 199747.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tarsus dei Maroniti
1 Nov 199747.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tarsus dei Maroniti
2011²61.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Joubbé, Sarba e Jounieh (Maronite), Lebanon

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine Nabil Andari
Bishop Antoine Nabil Andari (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Joubbé, Sarba e Jounieh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBilla
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame du Liban, Basilica, Harissa

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Joubbé, Sarba e Jounieh (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,168

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 20 Nov 2018

Quantcast