Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Baptist Wang Jin

Deceased

Bishop of Yuci [YŁtze], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1924Born
9 Jun 195127.1Ordained PriestPriest of Taiyuan [TaiyŁan], China
24 Jun 199975.1SelectedBishop of Yuci [YŁtze], China
14 Sep 199975.3Ordained BishopBishop of Yuci [YŁtze], China
23 Sep 201490.4DiedBishop of Yuci [YŁtze], China

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Wang Jin
Bishop John Baptist Wang Jin (born , died ) Bishop of Yuci [YŁtze]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceXi Jianhe, Archdiocese of Taiyuan [TaiyŁan]
Ordained BishopTai Road, Church, Yuci, Diocese of Yuci [YŁtze]
Death PlaceYuci, Diocese of Yuci [YŁtze]

  • a priest for 63.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 24 Sep 2018
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2015, Page 1,145
  • b/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,612
  • c1: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 25 Sep 2018

Quantcast