Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Benedict Bonaventura Zhangxin], O.F.M. †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Taiyuan [Taiyüan], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1911Born
1931²19.1EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor
1937¹25.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
18 Dec 198170.1Ordained BishopBishop of Taiyuan [Taiyüan], China
1994²82.1ResignedBishop of Taiyuan [Taiyüan], China
10 Sep 199987.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Taiyuan [Taiyüan], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benedict Bonaventura Zhangxin
Bishop Benedict Bonaventura Zhangxin O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Taiyuan [Taiyüan]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTaiyuan
Ordained BishopNantang, Cathedral, Peking, Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]

  • a priest for 62.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,094
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 12,984

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 28 Mar 2020

Quantcast