Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sylvester Li Jiantang (Liu Jiantang)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Taiyuan [Taiyüan], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1925Born
12 Mar 1956³30.2Ordained PriestPriest
1990²64.0SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Taiyuan [Taiyüan], China
1994²68.0SelectedBishop of Taiyuan [Taiyüan], China
18 Dec 199468.9Ordained BishopBishop of Taiyuan [Taiyüan], China
24 Nov 201387.9RetiredBishop of Taiyuan [Taiyüan], China
13 Aug 201791.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Taiyuan [Taiyüan], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sylvester Li Jiantang (Liu Jiantang)
Bishop Sylvester Li Jiantang (Liu Jiantang) (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Taiyuan [Taiyüan]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDong'ergou/Yuci
Ordained BishopTaiyuan, Archdiocese of Taiyuan [Taiyüan]

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 23 Sep 2018
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2,018, Page 1,134
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,208

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast