Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominic O’Brien

Deceased

Bishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1798Born
1821²22.4Ordained PriestPriest
3 Aug 185557.0AppointedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
30 Sep 185557.2Ordained BishopBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
12 Jun 187374.9DiedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dominic O’Brien
Bishop Dominic O’Brien (born , died ) Bishop of Waterford and Lismore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWaterford, Diocese of Waterford and Lismore
Ordained BishopHoly Trinity, Cathedral, Waterford, Diocese of Waterford and Lismore

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 596
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,211
  • c4: CB, 31 May 2013
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1855, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast