Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Peteani (Petrani)

Deceased

Bishop of Poreč i Pula


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1789BornGorizia
4 Oct 181223.1Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 182636.8SelectedBishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia
9 Apr 182737.6ConfirmedBishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia
24 Jun 182737.8Ordained BishopBishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia
30 Jun 182838.8AppointedBishop of Poreč i Pula, Croatia
27 Jun 185767.8DiedBishop of Poreč i Pula, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Antonio Peteani (Petrani) (VIAF: 316491826)
Bishop Antonio Peteani (Petrani) (born , died ) Bishop of Poreč i Pula

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1854, Page 156
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 299
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1827, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Jun 2016