Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Giurico

Deceased

Bishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1778BornVeglia
18 Oct 180123.4Ordained PriestPriest
1 Nov 182951.5SelectedBishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
5 Jul 183052.2ConfirmedBishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
21 Nov 183052.5Ordained BishopBishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
25 Mar 184263.9DiedBishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Antonio Giurico:
Bishop Antonio Giurico (born , died ) Bishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)

  • a priest for 40.4 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 317

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013