Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philipp Valentin Albrecht Voit von Rieneck

Deceased

Bishop of Bamberg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1612Born
13 Feb 165341.1SelectedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
14 Jan 165846.0ConfirmedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
17 Jul 166149.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bamberg, Germany
3 Feb 167260.1DiedBishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Philipp Valentin Albrecht Voit von Rieneck:
Bishop Philipp Valentin Albrecht Voit von Rieneck (born , died ) Bishop of Bamberg

  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 109
  • ob/c2+: CB, 23 Mar 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 24 Mar 2014