Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludwig Wilhelm Benz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt

Titular Bishop of Dardanus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1611BornKinzheim
31 Jan 165645.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany
31 Jan 165645.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Dardanus
30 Apr 165645.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dardanus
11 Feb 168372.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ludwig Wilhelm Benz:
Bishop Ludwig Wilhelm Benz (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt

  • a bishop for 26.8 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 24 Mar 2014