Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurenz Matthias Vincenz

Deceased

Bishop of Chur, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1874Born
16 Jul 189925.3Ordained PriestPriest of Chur, Switzerland
30 Mar 193258.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Chur, Switzerland
30 Mar 193258.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Paphus
6 May 193258.1SucceededBishop of Chur, Switzerland
22 May 193258.1Ordained BishopBishop of Chur, Switzerland
29 Jul 194167.3DiedBishop of Chur, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Laurenz Matthias Vincenz
Bishop Laurenz Matthias Vincenz (born , died ) Bishop of Chur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAndest

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast