Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pellegrino Consalvi

Deceased

Bishop of Fano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1729BornMacerata
8 Jun 175425.4Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 177546.1AppointedBishop of Fano, Italy
19 Mar 177546.2Ordained BishopBishop of Fano, Italy
2 Feb 178758.0DiedBishop of Fano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pellegrino Consalvi:
Bishop Pellegrino Consalvi (born , died ) Bishop of Fano

  • a priest for 32.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 213
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Dec 2015