Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Bonavisa

Deceased

Bishop of Spoleto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1680³BornSpoleto
11 Mar 171433.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
17 Mar 171433.5Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 174262.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Teos
21 Dec 174262.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Teos
11 Mar 174362.5AppointedBishop of Spoleto, Italy
21 Jul 175978.9DiedBishop of Spoleto, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Bonavisa:
Bishop Paolo Bonavisa (born , died ) Bishop of Spoleto

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 386, and Page 396
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1742, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015