Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Cardinal Vallemani

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1648BornFabriano, Italy
17 Jan 170051.6Ordained PriestPriest
5 Dec 170153.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Athenae
17 May 170657.9Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
1 Aug 170759.1Elevated to Cardinal
28 Nov 170759.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli
15 Dec 172577.5DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Vallemani:
Giuseppe Cardinal Vallemani (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli

  • a priest for 25.9 years
  • a cardinal for 19.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 May 1706
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1701, Number 24
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 103

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 20 May 2015